WI AB199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 967.08 (2) (a), 967.08 (2) (b), 967.08 (2) (d) and 967.08 (3); to amend 938.30 (10), 967.08 (title), 967.08 (1), 967.08 (2) (intro.), 967.08 (2) (c), 971.04 (1) (intro.) and 972.02 (1); and to create 938.325 and 967.08 (2) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: conducting juvenile proceedings by telephone or audiovisual means and appearance at any criminal proceeding by telephone or audiovisual means. (FE)
Title
Conducting juvenile proceedings by telephone or audiovisual means and appearance at any criminal proceeding by telephone or audiovisual means. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-11-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-25 | House | Representatives Steffen and Bowen added as coauthors |
2021-08-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2021-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced |