WI AB199 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 985.01 (7), 985.02 (2) (a), 985.02 (2) (b), 985.02 (2) (c), 985.02 (3) and 985.08 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: publication of certain legal notices on an Internet site maintained by a municipality. (FE)
Title
Publication of certain legal notices on an Internet site maintained by a municipality. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab199 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB199.pdf |