WI AB199 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.194 (title), 29.194 (1) (b), 29.235 (5) and 29.563 (12) (a) 2.; to repeal and recreate 29.194 (1) (title); and to create 29.235 (3m), 29.563 (4) (a) 2s., 29.563 (4) (b) 2s. and 29.563 (12) (a) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: hunting, fishing, and trapping approvals issued to recipients of the purple heart medal. (FE)
Title
Hunting, fishing, and trapping approvals issued to recipients of the purple heart medal. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-08-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-08-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2013-08-23 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2013-08-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-07-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-07-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2013-05-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-13 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2013-05-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2013-05-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab199 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB199.pdf |