WI AB196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.13 (1); and to create 118.132 of the statutes; Relating to: designating athletic sports and teams operated or sponsored by public schools or private schools participating in a parental choice program based on the sex of the participants.
Title
Designating athletic sports and teams operated or sponsored by public schools or private schools participating in a parental choice program based on the sex of the participants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report concurrence by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 2, Noes 3 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 38 |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2021-06-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-06-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-03-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Cabral-Guevara |
2021-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced |