WI AB196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.501 and 943.202 of the statutes; Relating to: possession of or use of a credit card scanner, providing civil immunity for sellers or distributors of fuel for scanners installed on pumps, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Title
Possession of or use of a credit card scanner, providing civil immunity for sellers or distributors of fuel for scanners installed on pumps, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-21 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-06-15 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-06-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-06 | House | Withdrawn from joint review committee on Criminal Penalties and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties |
2017-06-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 2 |
2017-06-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-17 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2017-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab196 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB196.pdf |