WI AB171 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.95 (1); and to create 346.89 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: operating a motor vehicle while wearing headphones or earbuds and providing a penalty.
Title
Operating a motor vehicle while wearing headphones or earbuds and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Eric Genrich [D] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2015-05-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab171 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB171.pdf |