WI AB131 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.1105 (5) (bg), 66.1105 (6) (am) 4., 66.1105 (6) (dm) 1., 66.1105 (6) (dm) 3. a., 66.1105 (6) (dm) 4. and 66.1105 (6) (e) 1. c.; and to amend 60.85 (4) (b) 2., 66.0602 (3) (dm), 66.1105 (4) (gm) 5., 66.1105 (4) (h) 1., 66.1105 (4e) (b) 3., 66.1105 (4m) (b) 2., 66.1105 (4m) (b) 2m., 66.1105 (6) (a) 7., 66.1105 (6) (a) 8., 66.1105 (6) (e) 1. b., 66.1105 (7) (am) 2., 66.1105 (7) (am) 3. and 66.1106 (3) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: industrial zoning requirements in tax incremental districts, planning commission notice for tax incremental district amendments, obsolete references relating to tax incremental districts, allocation of tax increments, joint review board review, and calculation of levy limits following dissolution of a tax incremental district. (FE)
Title
Industrial zoning requirements in tax incremental districts, planning commission notice for tax incremental district amendments, obsolete references relating to tax incremental districts, allocation of tax increments, joint review board review, and calculation of levy limits following dissolution of a tax incremental district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-04-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-03-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-30 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab131 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB131.pdf |