WI AB1075 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 234.66 (4) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: regional allocation of residential housing infrastructure revolving loan.
Title
Regional allocation of residential housing infrastructure revolving loan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 209 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:01 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced |