WI AB1049 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 77.51 (9) (e); and to create 77.51 (9) (e) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: the sales and use tax exemption for personal farm property or household goods sold by auction on the Internet. (FE)
Title
The sales and use tax exemption for personal farm property or household goods sold by auction on the Internet. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2024-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced |