WA SJM8012 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the designation of U.S. Highway 101 to honor recipients of the Medal of Honor.
Title
Requesting the designation of U.S. Highway 101 to honor recipients of the Medal of Honor.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |