WA SB6703 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding online nursing programs.
Title
Regarding online nursing programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6703&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6703.pdf |