WA SB6680 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties to impose local sales and use taxes for criminal justice purposes.
Title
Authorizing counties to impose local sales and use taxes for criminal justice purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |