WA SB6639 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating alternatives to total confinement for nonviolent offenders with minor children.
Title
Creating alternatives to total confinement for nonviolent offenders with minor children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-26 | Chapter 224, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-26 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3045 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.