WA SB6455 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the professional educator workforce by increasing career opportunities in education, creating a more robust enrollment forecasting, and enhancing recruitment efforts.
Title
Expanding the professional educator workforce by increasing career opportunities in education, creating a more robust enrollment forecasting, and enhancing recruitment efforts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 233, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-10 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-03-10 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-25 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2921 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.