WA HB2921 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the professional educator workforce by increasing career opportunities in education, creating a more robust enrollment forecasting, and enhancing recruitment efforts.
Title
Expanding the professional educator workforce by increasing career opportunities in education, creating a more robust enrollment forecasting, and enhancing recruitment efforts.
Sponsors
Rep. Teri Hickel [R] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:30 AM. |
2016-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6455 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2921&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2921.pdf |