WA SB6448 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting of hydraulic projects.
Title
Concerning permitting of hydraulic projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; do pass NROR 10 bill proposed by Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | NROR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3037 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.