WA SB6333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of antifouling paints on recreational water vessels.
Title
Concerning the use of antifouling paints on recreational water vessels.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | EENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2634 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.