WA HB2634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of antifouling paints on recreational water vessels.
Title
Concerning the use of antifouling paints on recreational water vessels.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Paul Graves [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-15 | House | Chapter 94, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB6333 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.