WA SB6306 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the penal sum of a surety bond required to be maintained by an appraisal management company.
Title
Increasing the penal sum of a surety bond required to be maintained by an appraisal management company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-01-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-31 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-30 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-17 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2566 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6306&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6306.pdf |