WA HB2566 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the penal sum of a surety bond required to be maintained by an appraisal management company.
Title
Increasing the penal sum of a surety bond required to be maintained by an appraisal management company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-24 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-23 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 9:00 AM. | |
2012-02-11 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-24 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-24 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-17 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6306 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.