WA SB6287 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a pilot program for cougar control.
Title
Concerning a pilot program for cougar control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |