WA SB6272 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning manufacturer and new motor vehicle dealer franchise agreements.
Title
Concerning manufacturer and new motor vehicle dealer franchise agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 214, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2524 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.