WA HB2524 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning manufacturer and new motor vehicle dealer franchise agreements.
Title
Concerning manufacturer and new motor vehicle dealer franchise agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-31 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6272 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.