WA SB6242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting school directors' compensation.
Title
Adjusting school directors' compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |