WA SB6240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding miniature hobby boilers.
Title
Regarding miniature hobby boilers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 259, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |