WA SB6217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning minimum labor standards for certain employees working at an airport or air navigation facility.
Title
Concerning minimum labor standards for certain employees working at an airport or air navigation facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 96, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2715 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.