WA HB2715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning minimum labor standards for certain employees working at an airport or air navigation facility.
Title
Concerning minimum labor standards for certain employees working at an airport or air navigation facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6217 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.