WA SB6217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the processes for reviewing sexually violent predators committed under chapter 71.09 RCW.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the processes for reviewing sexually violent predators committed under chapter 71.09 RCW.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-30SenateHSC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.

Same As/Similar To

HB2271 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Effective date 3/21/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback