WA HB2271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 3/21/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the processes for reviewing sexually violent predators committed under chapter 71.09 RCW.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the processes for reviewing sexually violent predators committed under chapter 71.09 RCW.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseEffective date 3/21/2018.
2018-03-21HouseChapter 131, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-21HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-03-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-03-07SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-03-07SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-22HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-01-26HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-18HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2017-12-12HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6217 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback