WA SB6190 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring full payment of all moneys due under the certificate of delinquency prior to any change of ownership of real property after a certificate of delinquency is issued.
Title
Requiring full payment of all moneys due under the certificate of delinquency prior to any change of ownership of real property after a certificate of delinquency is issued.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2410 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6190&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6190.pdf |