WA SB6185 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving the maritime heritage of the state of Washington.
Title
Preserving the maritime heritage of the state of Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-04 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-17 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2379 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6185&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6185.pdf |