WA SB6180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Title
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 249, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2796 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.