WA HB2796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Title
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6180 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.