WA SB6172 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Washington citizens from warrantless surveillance, reducing liability, and establishing clear standards under which agencies may utilize unmanned aerial vehicles.
Title
Protecting Washington citizens from warrantless surveillance, reducing liability, and establishing clear standards under which agencies may utilize unmanned aerial vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |