WA SB6138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the establishment of thermal energy networks.
Title
Promoting the establishment of thermal energy networks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2131 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
54 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
80 | 04 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
80 | 28 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |