WA SB6114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 1st Substitute: Requiring certain operators to provide sustainable aviation fuel for use in private jets.Original: Requiring local airport operators to provide sustainable aviation fuel for use in private jets.
Title
Revised for 1st Substitute: Requiring certain operators to provide sustainable aviation fuel for use in private jets.Original: Requiring local airport operators to provide sustainable aviation fuel for use in private jets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |