WA SB6095 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 3/27/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 3/27/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the capital budget.
Title
Concerning the capital budget.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 3/27/2018. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 298, 2018 Laws PV. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-03-06 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Frockt, Mullet, Honeyford. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2395 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.