WA HB2395 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the capital budget.
Title
Concerning the capital budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6095 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Effective date 3/27/2018.