WA SB6066 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting tow truck operators using the telephone call functionality of a wireless communications device from traffic infractions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting tow truck operators using the telephone call functionality of a wireless communications device from traffic infractions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-27HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation
2018-02-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-23SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2018-01-03SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2706 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback