WA HB2706 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting tow truck operators using the telephone call functionality of a wireless communications device from traffic infractions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting tow truck operators using the telephone call functionality of a wireless communications device from traffic infractions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB6066 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback