WA SB6039 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a sentence for treatment program for juvenile offenders.
Title
Creating a sentence for treatment program for juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2234 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6039&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6039.pdf |