WA SB6012 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting renewable energy through modifying tax incentives.
Title
Promoting renewable energy through modifying tax incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-04 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |