WA SB5991 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending mandatory child abuse reporting requirements to specified employees of institutions of higher education.
Title
Extending mandatory child abuse reporting requirements to specified employees of institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-19 | Chapter 55, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-03 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-21 | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-21 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-14 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-07 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2012-01-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |