WA SB5975 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing use of the housing trust fund and other legislative appropriations to finance social housing.
Title
Authorizing use of the housing trust fund and other legislative appropriations to finance social housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 185a | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |