WA SB5970 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements.
Title
Evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] |
Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-20 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-20 | House | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1859 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.