WA HB1859 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements.
Title
Evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-01-31 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-20 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5970 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.