WA SB5950 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 3/29/2024. |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 376, 2024 Laws PV. |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-07 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 1:00 PM 3/6/2024. |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference committee report; received 12:26 PM 3/6/2024. |
2024-03-05 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Corry, Gregerson, Ormsby. |
2024-03-05 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Robinson, Nguyen, Wilson, L.. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2024-02-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-24 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-24 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2104 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 101 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |