WA HB2104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5950 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 101 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |