WA SB5932 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adult family homes.
Title
Concerning adult family homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1935 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5932&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5932.pdf |