WA SB5930 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing tribal governments to participate in exchange agreements without certain restrictions.
Title
Allowing tribal governments to participate in exchange agreements without certain restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1934 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.